Donovan, Keith Duane (CPSO#: 65587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone: (519) 667-6538
Fax: (519) 667-6769
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N5Y 2Y4
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Donovan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Donovan ( CPSO# 65587 )

Business Address:
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Business Address:
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 6B5
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH DUANE DONOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONOVAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1993