Donsky, Judith Elana (CPSO#: 70177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 503-504
1110 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M2K 2W2
Phone: (416) 226-4294
Fax: (416) 226-1928
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 206
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 731-7596
Fax: (905) 731-4975
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 803
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X1W4
Canada
Phone: 416-596-1155
Fax: 416-596-1156
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Canada
Phone: 416-461-9471
Fax: 416-461-2710
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: 416-654-5437
Fax: 647-689-2371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 17 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ELANA DONSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DONSKY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2000