Doran, Joseph Richard (CPSO#: 52964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 433-2800
Fax: (905) 697-4696
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

The Pain Management Clinic - Taunto
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
Phone: 905-721-2750
Fax: 905-721-2658
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Oshawa Physiotherapy and Rehabilita
22 Stevenson Road South, Unit C1
Oshawa ON  L1J 5L9
Canada
Phone: 905-579-9938
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Doran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Doran ( CPSO# 52964 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Centre
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1J 8P5
Phone Number: (905) 721-2750

Business Address:
C1 - 22 Stevenson Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5L9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 08 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH RICHARD DORAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1983 to 15 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988