Dorrepaal, Stephen John (CPSO#: 84650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarity Eye Institute
9135 Keele Street, Unit A5
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4
Phone: (416) 663-3937 Ext. 225
Fax: (416) 663-3731
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenu
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

#308 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Clarity Eye Institute
#300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Canada
Phone: (416) 663-3937
Fax: (416) 663-3731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Belleville Macula Eye Clinic
29 Wallbridge Crescent
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Canada
Phone: 1-855-544-3400 Ext. 2456
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

Brockville Macula Eye Clinic
The Wedgewood
15 Market Street East
Brockville ON  K6V 0A6
Canada
Phone: 1-855-544-3400 Ext. 2456
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

125 Bell Farm Road
Suite #206
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Canada
Phone: (705) 725-5443
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen Dorrepaal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dorrepaal ( CPSO# 84650 )

Business Address:
300 - 240 Alton Towers Circle
Scarborough ON  M1V 3Z3
Phone Number: (416) 663-3937

Business Address:
308 - 531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-7414

Business Address:
Suite 206
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON  L4M 6L2
Phone Number: (705) 725-5443

Business Address:
Mackenzie Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
A5
9135 Keele Street
Vaughan ON  L4K 0J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN DORREPAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORREPAAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011