Doss, Chrishanthini Marina (CPSO#: 62305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southbank Medical Center
3 - 2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone: (613) 736-6946
Fax: (613) 736-6948
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

College Square Medical Centre
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Canada
Phone: (613) 224-6606
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. M. Doss Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Doss ( CPSO# 62305 )

Business Address:
3 - 2430 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1V 0T7
Phone Number: (613) 736-6946

Business Address:
1980 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 0C6
Phone Number: (613) 224-6606

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISHANTHINI MARINA DOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1991