Douglas, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 70512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Str
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Devereaux Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Douglas ( CPSO# 70512 )
Dr. P. Devereaux ( CPSO# 69774 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Business Address:
Population Health Research Inst
David Braley Cardic Vascular and
Stroke Research Institute
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Jul 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Aug 1996 to 22 Sep 1996
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2000