Douglas, Ruth Margaret (CPSO#: 55470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5959 New Street
Burlington ON  L7L 6W5
Phone: 905-639-6389
Fax: 905-634-2584
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Padonou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Padonou ( CPSO# 55718 )
Dr. R. Douglas ( CPSO# 55470 )

Business Address:
101 Queensway West
Suite 208
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 896-8996


Corporation Name: R. Douglas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Douglas ( CPSO# 55470 )

Business Address:
5959 New Street
Burlington ON  L7L 6W5
Phone Number: (905) 639-6389

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUTH MARGARET DOUGLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUGLAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1986