Doukas, Kathleen Eleni (CPSO#: 88495)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 867-3728
Fax: (416) 867-3726
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Covenant House Toronto
20 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 1S9
Canada
Phone: (416) 598-4898
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Doukas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Doukas ( CPSO# 88495 )

Business Address:
4th Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone Number: (416) 867-3728

Business Address:
Covenant House
20 Gerrard Street East
Toronto ON  M5B 2P3
Phone Number: (416) 598-4898

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ELENI DOUKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOUKAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010