Dow, Kimberly Elizabeth (CPSO#: 33592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Names: MacDonald, Kimberly Elizabeth (used until: 22 Nov 2010 )     Dow MacDonald, Kimberly Elizabeth (used until: 12 Sep 2010 )     MacDonald, Kimberly Elizabeth (used until: 26 Jan 2010 )     Dow, Kimberly Elizabeth (used until: 11 Jul 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Room 4-3-402
Watkins D
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6046
Fax: (613) 548-1369
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Dow Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dow ( CPSO# 33592 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Room 4-3-402
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6046

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ELIZABETH DOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1982