Doyle, Leilani Nanette (CPSO#: 76966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 722-7000
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leilani N. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Doyle ( CPSO# 76966 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital- Civic Campus
Department of Anesthesia
B311 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
CCW 1401
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L8
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEILANI NANETTE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2001