Doyle, Mary-Anne (CPSO#: 82881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive, 4th floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81946
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.A. Doyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Doyle ( CPSO# 82881 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Drive
4th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY-ANNE DOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 15 Jan 2008 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 8 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 9 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011