Dresser, George Kenneth (CPSO#: 67865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Room E6-302
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-3342
Fax: (519) 663-3388
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. K. Dresser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dresser ( CPSO# 67865 )

Business Address:
Victoria Hospital
Room E6 - 302
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 663-3342

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE KENNETH DRESSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRESSER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Pharmacology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1998