Drijber, Ferdinand Louis Ian Philip (CPSO#: 65134)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Care Centre Suite 1
75 Parkview Road
P O Box 398
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone: (905) 768-1979
Fax: (905) 768-3801
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Philip Drijber Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Drijber ( CPSO# 65134 )
Dr. S. Drijber ( CPSO# 65010 )

Business Address:
Health Care Centre
Suite 1
P O Box 398
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-1979

Business Address:
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7

Business Address:
305 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe
West Haldimand,General Hospital Hagersville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FERDINAND LOUIS IAN PHILIP DRIJBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRIJBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993