Droll, Kurt Paul (CPSO#: 75044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Big Thunder Orthopaedic Associates
Suite 206
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 344-1123
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Droll and Chen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Chen ( CPSO# 76412 )
Dr. K. Droll ( CPSO# 75044 )

Business Address:
Big Thunder Orthopaedic Associates
206 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 344-1123

Business Address:
Lakehead University Student Health and
Couselling Centre
UC 1007 - 955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5E1
Phone Number: (807) 343-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KURT PAUL DROLL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DROLL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2007