Drosdowech, Darren Sean (CPSO#: 62321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hand Upper Limb Centre
Saint Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6047
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drosdowech Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Drosdowech ( CPSO# 62321 )

Business Address:
Hand and Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6047

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARREN SEAN DROSDOWECH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DROSDOWECH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1993