Drover, John Wilson (CPSO#: 56031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6336
Fax: (613) 548-1325
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Drover Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Drover ( CPSO# 56031 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILSON DROVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DROVER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1985