Drury, Robert Donald (CPSO#: 27470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert D. Drury Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Drury ( CPSO# 27470 )

Business Address:
1515 Blanshard Street
Victoria BC  V8W 3C8
Phone Number: (877) 357-4757

Business Address:
105 - 199 Grafton Street
Charlottetown PE  C1A 1L2
Phone Number: (902) 566-5212

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
301 - 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Business Address:
Weeneebayko Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 13 Apr 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 13 Apr 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 13, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Robert Donald Drury,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Drury to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                           DR. ROBERT DRURY
                                             ("Dr. Drury")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Drury, certificate of registration number 27470, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing File Number 7214116 (the "Investigation") into
                  concerns in respect of concerns arising from my provision of
                  collaborative care in conjunction with nurse practitioners, including
                  regarding my prescribing of narcotics.

            (4)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and agree that, upon receiving an original copy
                  of this Undertaking as signed by me, the College will take no further
                  action with respect to the Investigation.

            B.    UNDERTAKING AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (5)   I, Dr. Drury, understand and agree that I am bound by this Undertaking
                  from the date on which I sign it. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (7)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and agree that I have comprehensively reviewed
                  the College's Policy Statement # 3-16, "Prescribing Drugs," (the
                  "Prescribing Policy"), and that I am aware of my duty to comply fully
                  with the Prescribing Policy, as that document is amended from time to
                  time.  The Prescribing Policy is currently located online at:

            http://www.cpso.on.ca/CPSO/media/uploadedfiles/policies/policies/policyitems/prescribing_drugs.pdf?ext=.pdf

            (8)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and agree that I have comprehensively reviewed
                  the College's Policy Statement # 5-12, "Delegation of Controlled Acts,"
                  (the "Delegation Policy"), and that I am aware of my duty to comply fully
                  with the Delegation Policy, as that document is amended from time to
                  time.  The Delegation Policy is currently located online at: 

            http://www.cpso.on.ca/CPSO/media/uploadedfiles/policies/policies/policyitems/delegation.pdf?ext=.pdf 

            (9)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and agree that I have comprehensively reviewed
                  the Canadian Guidelines for the Safe and Effective Use of Opioids for
                  Chronic Non-Cancer Pain (the "Opioid Guidelines"), and that I am aware of
                  my duty to comply fully with the Opioid Guidelines, as that document is
                  amended from time to time.  The Opioid Guidelines are currently located
                  online at:

            http://nationalpaincentre.mcmaster.ca/opioid/ 

            (10)  I, Dr. Drury, undertake to establish a physician-patient relationship
                  with an individual and document my current knowledge of their clinical
                  status, prior to prescribing any of the following substances for him or
                  her, except if prescribing a substance to an individual that was
                  previously prescribed by another physician for the purpose of palliative
                  care and the other physician will be resuming care of the individual:

                  a)    Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                        the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  b)    Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
                  c)    Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                        under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); 
                  d)    Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made
                        under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19); 
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  e)    All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule
                        "C");                                
                        and as amended from time to time.
                  
            (11)  I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and agree that I have comprehensively reviewed
                  the College's Policy Statement # 3-14, "Telemedicine" (the "Telemedicine
                  Policy"), and that I am aware of my duty to fully comply with the
                  Telemedicine Policy, as that document is amended from time to time.  The
                  Telemedicine Policy is currently located online at: 

            http://www.cpso.on.ca/CPSO/media/documents/Policies/Policy-Items/Telemedicine.pdf?ext=.pdf 

            (12)  I, Dr. Drury, undertake to ensure that, when I am providing or assisting
                  in the provision of care to patients at a distance using information and
                  communication technologies, the patient is accurately identified and the
                  privacy and confidentiality of the patient's personal health information
                  is protected.

            (13)  I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (14)  I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so. 

            (15)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Drury, undertake that, approximately twelve (12)  months
                        after the College's receipt of this executed Undertaking, I will
                        submit to a Reassessment of my practice in respect of care provided
                        collaboratively with other professionals and care provided at a
                        distance ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that
                        the Reassessment may include a chart review, direct observation of
                        my care, interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from
                        patients and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Drury, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the ICR
                        Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Drury, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have thirty (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations
                        within which to provide the College with my submissions in this
                        regard.  I further understand and agree that thereafter, the ICR
                        Committee will consider my submissions and make a determination
                        regarding whether or not the recommendations, or any of them, are
                        reasonable and if so, whether they, or any of them, constitute
                        limitations or restrictions on my practice, and that decision will
                        be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Drury, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (15)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Drury, hereby consent to any of the following being included
                        on the public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        a.    any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are terms,
                              conditions or limitations on my practice;  
                  
                        b.    any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (15)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (16)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Drury, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), and any location
                        where I provide care, including at a distance, or assist in
                        providing care, in collaboration with a nurse practitioner or other
                        health professional in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice
                        Location(s)"), as well as the identities of any nurse practitioners
                        in collaboration with whom I provide care or assist in providing
                        care ("Collaborative Nurse Practitioner") at any Practice
                        Location(s), within fifteen (15) days of executing this
                        Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the
                        College of any and all new Practice Locations and any and all
                        Collaborative Nurse Practitioners within fifteen (15) days of
                        commencing practice at that location or commencing to provide care
                        in collaboration with that Collaborative Nurse Practitioner.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Drury, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Drury, undertake to comply with the provisions of this Undertaking
                  and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking
                  may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and
                  may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline
                  Committee.

            (18)  I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (19)  I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Drury was the subject of a College investigation into concerns
                        arising from his provision of collaborative care in conjunction
                        with nurse practitioners, including regarding his prescribing of
                        narcotics.  As a result of the investigation, Dr. Drury has
                        acknowledged his obligations to comply with certain College
                        policies and guidelines, and has undertaken to establish a
                        physician-patient relationship with an individual before
                        prescribing narcotics or controlled substances to him or her,
                        except if prescribing a substance to an individual that was
                        previously prescribed by another physician for the purpose of
                        palliative care and the other physician will be resuming care of
                        the individual. As well, Dr. Drury's practice in respect of care
                        provided collaboratively with other professionals and care provided
                        at a distance will be reassessed approximately twelve (12) months
                        after the College's receipt of the executed undertaking.
                  
            C.    CONSENT

            (20)  I, Dr. Drury, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities ("Chief of Staff"), and to any Collaborative Nurse
                  Practitioner, and to provide said persons with any information the
                  College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this
                  Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my
                  compliance with this Undertaking.

            (21)  I, Dr. Drury, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to all Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Drury, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section (6) above,
                  and to all  Chiefs of Staff, Collaborative Nurse Practitioners, and
                  Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any
                  information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (c)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (d)   which comes to his or her attention, and which he or she reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (23)  I, Dr. Drury, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan ("OHIP"), the
                  Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System ("NMS")
                  implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, and/or
                  any person or institution who may have relevant information, in order for
                  the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (24)  I, Dr. Drury, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent
                  form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "D" and Schedule "E", respectively.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 13, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Donald Drury to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 13, 2016:

Dr. Drury was the subject of a College investigation into concerns arising from his provision of collaborative care in conjunction with nurse practitioners, including regarding his prescribing of narcotics. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Drury has acknowledged his obligations to comply with certain College policies and guidelines, and has undertaken to establish a physician-patient relationship with an individual before prescribing narcotics or controlled substances to him or her, except if prescribing a substance to an individual that was previously prescribed by another physician for the purpose of palliative care and the other physician will be resuming care of the individual. As well, Dr. Drury’s practice in respect of care provided collaboratively with other professionals and care provided at a distance will be reassessed approximately twelve (12) months after the College’s receipt of the executed undertaking.