Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Druzin, Paul Allan (CPSO#: 69699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Colborne Street
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Phone: (705) 887-3535
Fax: (705) 887-3530
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St John's Rehab Hospital
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Canada
Phone: (416) 226-6780
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Druzin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Druzin ( CPSO# 69699 )

Business Address:
50 Colborne Street
Box 129
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 887-3535

Business Address:
285 Cummer Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 2G1
Phone Number: (416) 226-6780

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ALLAN DRUZIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DRUZIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Nov 1995 to 17 Dec 1995
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1996