Dudar, Amber Dawn (CPSO#: 83582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7756
Fax: (807) 346-6206
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Dudar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dudar ( CPSO# 83582 )

Business Address:
The Port Arthur Clinic
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Hospital
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBER DAWN DUDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2005 to 26 Aug 2005
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 11 Dec 2006 to 07 Jan 2007
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 03 May 2007 to 30 May 2007
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2008