Dufresne, Genevieve Danielle (CPSO#: 84607)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
805 Sydney Street, Unit 3A-B
Cornwall ON  K6H 3J7
Phone: (613)702-0270
Fax: (613) 209-7732
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

11 Selkirk Street
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N1
Canada
Phone: (613) 763-6882
Fax: (613) 317-1889
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Genevieve Dufresne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dufresne ( CPSO# 84607 )

Business Address:
805 Sydney Street
Suite 3
Cornwall ON  K6H 3J7
Phone Number: (613) 703-0270

Business Address:
11 Selkirk Street
Ottawa ON  K1L 6N1
Phone Number: (613) 763-6682

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE DANIELLE DUFRESNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFRESNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2008