Duggal, Neil (CPSO#: 65435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinical Neurological Sciences
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-2926
Fax: (519) 663-2947
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duggal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Duggal ( CPSO# 65435 )

Business Address:
Clinical Neurological Sciences
London Health Sciences Centre - University Campus
339 Windermere Road
Room A10-314
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-2926

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL DUGGAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUGGAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000