Duncan, Sarah Lyn Haggith (CPSO#: 88496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Duncan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duncan ( CPSO# 88496 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON  P3Y 1J3
Phone Number: (705) 692-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH LYN HAGGITH DUNCAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUNCAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2010