Dunn, Desiree Ruth (CPSO#: 76167)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: King and Dunn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 9 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2003 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2011