Durno, Carol Anne (CPSO#: 63982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centenary Health Centre Site
Galaxy 12
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7476
Fax: (416) 281-7313
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carol Durno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Durno ( CPSO# 63982 )

Business Address:
Centenary Health Centre
Clinic 12
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-6185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROL ANNE DURNO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURNO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1992