Dwosh, Adam Akiva (CPSO#: 68844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bathurst Steeles Health Centre
6257 Bathurst Street
2nd Floor
North York ON  M2R 2A5
Phone: (416) 223-9791
Fax: (416) 223-9558
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adam Dwosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Dwosh ( CPSO# 68844 )

Business Address:
Bathurst Steeles Health Centre
200 - 6257 Bathurst Street
North York ON  M2R 2A5
Phone Number: (416) 223-9791

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADAM AKIVA DWOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DWOSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1997