Dymon, Diane Andrea (CPSO#: 69272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Middlesex London Health Unit
50 King Street
London ON  N6A 5L7
Phone: (519) 663-5446
Fax: (519) 663-8273
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bains and Dymon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 7 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANE ANDREA DYMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DYMON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1997