Dziurdzy, Stanley Andrew (CPSO#: 19329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Oct 1964

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1964

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A
1463 Ontario Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1G6
Phone: (905) 632-2543
Fax: (905) 632-5643
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Canada
Phone: (905) 632-3730 Ext. 4125
Fax: (905) 681-4842
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STANLEY ANDREW DZIURDZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZIURDZY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 18 Feb 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1971