E, Choan Choun (CPSO#: 66813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Regional
Cancer Centre
PO Box 903
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70202
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C. E. Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mirzaei ( CPSO# 81230 )
Dr. C. E ( CPSO# 66813 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHOAN CHOUN E may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. E is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1998