Torbicki, Emma Sefton (CPSO#: 109326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 613-533-2543
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Torbicki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Dr. E. Torbicki ( CPSO# 109326)
Dr. E. Torbicki ( CPSO# 51930 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
K-W Health Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Anesthesia Associates
439 Park Street - 2nd Floor
Kitchener ON  N2G 1N4
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Business Address:
Dr. Jeffrey Wallace
60 Bridgeport Road East
Kitchener ON  N2J 2J9
Phone Number: (519) 884-2500

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. EMMA SEFTON TORBICKI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. TORBICKI is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. TORBICKI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. TORBICKI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. TORBICKI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. TORBICKI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. TORBICKI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018