Eapen, Libni Joseph (CPSO#: 50472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Box 903
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70206
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Libni Eapen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Eapen ( CPSO# 50472 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIBNI JOSEPH EAPEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EAPEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1983