Earlam, Karen Jean (CPSO#: 91251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 725-9374
Fax: (613) 725-9195
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen J. Earlam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Earlam ( CPSO# 91251 )

Business Address:
308 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 725-9374

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
505 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 737-7350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Rehabilitation Centre Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN JEAN EARLAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EARLAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2014