Easterbrook, Mark Douglas (CPSO#: 73752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
753 Tower Street, S
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone: (519) 843-4380
Fax: (519) 843-3211
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Easterbrook Petrov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Easterbrook ( CPSO# 73752 )
Dr. N. Petrov ( CPSO# 71077 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W2
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Business Address:
University of Guelph
Student Health Services
50 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: (519) 824-4120

Business Address:
801 St. David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Phone Number: (519) 787-2940

Business Address:
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 843-4380

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DOUGLAS EASTERBROOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EASTERBROOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2001