Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Edwards, Neil William (CPSO#: 55454)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
750 Oklahoma Dr. Unit 5A
Pickering ON  L1W 3G9
Phone: 905 831 8666
Fax: 905 831 8749
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: (905) 683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Edwards Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Edwards ( CPSO# 55454 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System - Ajax Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Unit 5A
750 Oklahome Drive
Pickering ON  L1W 3G9
Phone Number: (905) 831-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL WILLIAM EDWARDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EDWARDS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1986