Egbewunmi, Adeyemi Tiwalade (CPSO#: 99401)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ibadan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Hospital-Ajax campus
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egbewunmi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Egbewunmi ( CPSO# 99401 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
580 Hardwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 284-8131

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Adeyemi   Tiwalade  Egbewunmi  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            psychiatry.