Egri, Zoltan Jozsef (CPSO#: 70923)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 781-9500
Fax: (416) 781-7985
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Egri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Egri ( CPSO# 70923 )

Business Address:
Suite 500
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 781-9500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jul 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 21 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZOLTAN JOZSEF EGRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996