Ehsan, Saima (CPSO#: 94094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (905) 336-9630
Fax: (905) 336-9626
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saima Ehsan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ehsan ( CPSO# 94094 )

Business Address:
Halton Family Health Centre
2951 Walkers Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (289) 336-9630

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAIMA EHSAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EHSAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Dec 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 25 Dec 2010 to 26 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 27 Sep 2011 to 24 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Dec 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012