Eisen, Andrea Frances (CPSO#: 65305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, T2-038
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4617
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Eisen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 13 2015

Dr. A. Eisen ( CPSO# 65305 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
Suite T2-038
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4617

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ANDREA FRANCES EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993