Eisen, Joel Nathan (CPSO#: 33681)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard
Suite 301
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 884-5387
Fax: (905) 884-5387
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel N. Eisen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Eisen ( CPSO# 33681 )

Business Address:
301 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 884-5387

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL NATHAN EISEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 1987