Eisenstat, David Daniel (CPSO#: 56452)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Edmonton Clinic Health Academy
Department of Pediatrics
Room 3 518
11405 87 Avenue
Edmonton AB  T6G 1C9
Phone: (780) 248-5522
Fax: (888) 775-9068
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stollery Children's Hospital
4E2 Pediatric Oncology Clinic
8440 112 Street
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Canada
Phone: (780) 407-8798
Fax: (780) 407-8821
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DANIEL EISENSTAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EISENSTAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 20 Jul 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Resident 4 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1991 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1987