Ek, Nathan Richard (CPSO#: 57313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone: (705) 567-2224
Fax: (705) 567-3838
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Body Beautiful Spa
29 Prospect Avenue
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 2V3
Canada
Phone: (705) 567-5700
County: Territorial District of Timiskaming
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nathan Ek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Ek ( CPSO# 57313 )

Business Address:
2 Water Lane
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3M6
Phone Number: (705) 567-2224

Business Address:
15 Government Road East
Kirkland Lake ON  P2N 3P4
Phone Number: (705) 567-5251

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN RICHARD EK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1987