El Hajj, May Ibrahim (CPSO#: 74153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:American University of Beirut, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 3
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone: (905) 268-0520
Fax: (905) 268-0521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 406 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Canada
Phone: (905) 268-9928
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: May El Hajj Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. El Hajj ( CPSO# 74153 )

Business Address:
406-89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-9928

Business Address:
640 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 3
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-0520

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 17 Oct 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAY IBRAHIM EL HAJJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL HAJJ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

McMaster University, 20 Sep 2002 to 18 Oct 2002
PEAP - Resident - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 19 Oct 2002 to 17 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2005