El Rabaa, Hoda Abbas Ahmed (CPSO#: 89823)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Main West Walk In Clinic
Suite 135 B
1685 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1G5
Phone: (905) 521-2229
Fax: (905) 521-2226
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1-260 Nebo RD
Hamilton ON  L8W 3K5
Canada
Phone: (905) 381-9800
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El Rabaa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. H. El Rabaa ( CPSO# 89823 )

Business Address:
Suite 135 B
1685 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1G5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2222

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HODA ABBAS AHMED EL RABAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL RABAA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.

Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP.
Download Full Document (PDF)