El-Keeb, Rabea AbdulMonaim Hasen (CPSO#: 78945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4996
Fax: (905) 721-3557
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Keeb Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. El-Keeb ( CPSO# 78945 )

Business Address:
3rd Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4996

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 08 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RABEA ABDULMONAIM HASEN EL-KEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KEEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2008