ElKhashab, Magdy Abd El Monaem Hassan Ahmed (CPSO#: 60419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Nov 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: El-Khashab, Magdy Abd El Monaem Hassan Ahmed (used until: 17 May 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1664 Dufferin Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone: (416) 652-0606
Fax: (416) 652-0633
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Magdy El-Khashab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2008


Corporation Name: Magdy ElKhashab Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. ElKhashab ( CPSO# 60419 )

Business Address:
1664 Dufferin Street
2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M6H 3M1
Phone Number: (416) 652-0606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAGDY ABD EL MONAEM HASSAN AHMED ELKHASHAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELKHASHAB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1993