El-Zabet, Ajda Jan (CPSO#: 101161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L1L0
Phone: 705-653-1140
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. El-Zabet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. El-Zabet ( CPSO# 101161)

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drivr
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6

Business Address:
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X3

Business Address:
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AJDA JAN EL-ZABET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-ZABET is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2013 to 23 Aug 2013
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 21 Dec 2015 to 10 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015