Elahi, Mohammed Mahmood (CPSO#: 64096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2304 Islington Ave
Main Floor
Toronto ON  M9W 3W9
Phone: (647) 348-0588
Fax: (647) 348-5807
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1900 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON
L6A 4R9
Vaughan ON  L6A 4R9
Canada
Phone: (905) 787-2062
Fax: (909) 832-3455
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

205 Van Kirk Drive #12
Brampton Ontario
Brampton ON  L7A 3V4
Canada
Phone: (905) 495-2254
Fax: (905) 495-5350
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records at the clinic that Dr. Elahi saw the patient at.
Date Received: 14 Aug 2012

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMMED MAHMOOD ELAHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELAHI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992