Elbarasi, Esam Abdelkarim (CPSO#: 86816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Garyounis University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Premium Cardiac Centre
Unit 227- 80 Maritime Ontario Blvd.
Brampton ON  L6S 0E7
Phone: (905) 790-7907
Fax: (905) 790-7909
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Healthy Way Medical Diagnostic
Centre
#6-50 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4W2
Canada
Phone: 5193078800
Fax: 5193078810
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

William Osler Health system
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Esam Elbarasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elbarasi ( CPSO# 86816 )

Business Address:
The Health Way Medical Diagnostic Centre
6 - 50 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4W2
Phone Number: (519) 307-8800

Business Address:
Premium Cardiac Centre
Suite 227
80 Maritime Ontario Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E7
Phone Number: (905) 790-7907

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESAM ABDELKARIM ELBARASI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELBARASI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Feb 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2011