Elepano, Patricia (CPSO#: 66460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 200
440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone: (519) 471-2929
Fax: (519) 471-1082
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armstrong and Elepano Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Elepano ( CPSO# 66460 )
Dr. C. Armstrong ( CPSO# 66765 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
200 - 440 Boler Road
London ON  N6K 4L2
Phone Number: (519) 471-2929

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELEPANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELEPANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1995