Elia, Eshay (CPSO#: 95914)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Assyrian, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
146 Oliver Rd
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Millhaven Institution (CSC)
Health Services Department
Highway 33
PO Box 280
Bath ON  K0H1G0
Canada
Phone: (613) 351-8229
Fax: (613) 351-8230
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eshay Elia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Elia ( CPSO# 95914 )

Business Address:
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ESHAY ELIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014