Eliosoff, Ronald Victor (CPSO#: 61904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Phone: (613) 236-9441
Fax: (613) 236-9425
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald Eliosoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Eliosoff ( CPSO# 61904 )

Business Address:
3001 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2B 7Y6
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Business Address:
368 Slater Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 5C1
Phone Number: (613) 791-1945

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD VICTOR ELIOSOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELIOSOFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2006